Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Froelick, Deborah, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Zel, Canter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZel, Canter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateJune 22, 2007 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time39 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
October 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Zel, Canter |
|
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing, Filed | |
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.