Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Amber Productions Tv Film Video, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hogan, Bruce W, against Addamo Estate Vineyards Llc, Addamo, David, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Garcia, Arthur A presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 29, 2008 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions47 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time47 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Debtor's Examination
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of Attachment
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
October 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Application & Order to Appear for Exam, Filed | |
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
October 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
October 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.