Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Boston Reed College, Blaschke, Carol, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Flores, Beatriz Pimental, against Boston Reed College, represented by Friedenthal, Daniel R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2008 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time217 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
April 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion: Compel
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 17, 2009 | Docket Event | CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion, Filed | |
January 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.