Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jensen, Julie, Jensen, Raymond, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ware, Sam, against Ciy Of Santa Maria, Birdsall, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Garcia, Arthur A presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management132 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2008 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time131 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
January 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Proof of Service
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Response, Filed | |
November 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause, Filed | |
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.