Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavallaro, Norma A, Cavallaro, Greg V, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Milder, Jonathan S, against Surety Company Of The Pacific, Land, Carol J, Land, Rodney D, represented by Geissler, Paul R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Garcia, Arthur A presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management131 days |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2008 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney, Filed | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement, Filed | |
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Statement-Agreement or Non-Agreement, Filed | |
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event | CADRe | |
November 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.