Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Investment Retrievers Inc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Dawson, Chassity D, against Moreno, Cruz, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions152 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time152 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Return on Writ of Attachment/Execution, Filed | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Return on Writ of Attachment/Execution, Filed | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney, Filed | |
December 23, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Return on Warrant of Attachment Tentative
Judge: Colleen Sterne |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Return on Warrant of Attachment
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Debtor's Examination
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.