Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Santa Barbara Highlands Homeowners Assn, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Shoemaker, Jeff, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Judge, No Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, No Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims Out Of Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time299 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Correspondence, Received | |
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Order Setting New Date, Filed | |
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.