Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alpha Plumbing & Heating Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Duenow, Christopher J, against Morrissey Construction Company, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
JudgedeBellefeuille, Denise Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2007 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time152 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.