Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Fugate, Paul Albert, represented by Moore, Rory, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with DeCaro, Edward presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2008 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Arrest Disposition Report, Sent | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Informational Purposes
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Unscheduled Event Completed/Held | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint Continued
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Husing, Sylvia |
|
August 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint - Misdemeanor, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.