Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Coasthills Federal Credity Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Becker, Howard Mark, against Corral, John G, Molina Corral, Jennifer R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2007 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions152 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time152 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
October 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.