Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Commerce And Industry Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Chaney, Marcus F, against Miranda, Adele, Mirandas Landscaping Inc, represented by Brenneman, Richard C, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Garcia, Arthur A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarcia, Arthur A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management119 days |
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2007 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time222 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
July 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement, Filed | |
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.