Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wisz, Melissa J, Wisz, Steven C, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Segura, Cynthia B, Segura, Gabriel, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Belasco, Steven D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBelasco, Steven D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time33 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Original Application (CRC 985(i)) | |
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Defendant's Claim & Order to Plaintiff | |
October 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
September 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.