Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kirkland, Shane, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weldon, Richard P, against Gotsev, Ivalo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management81 days |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2007 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
Time To Trial123 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions126 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time126 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment, Issued | |
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
November 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment, Filed | |
January 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Trial Brief, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.