Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rubalcava, Annabella, Cortez, Daniel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Weilbacher, William, Jr, against Hottel, Richard S, Wendel, Kenneth James, represented by Orszag, Paul, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time302 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement, Filed | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Statement-Agreement or Non-Agreement, Filed | |
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event | CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.