Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Resurgence Financial Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cook, Jordan D, against Jahangir, Bahador, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with McLafferty, James William presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLafferty, James William Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.