Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Toyota Motor Credit Corp, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude, Raymond A, against Hernandez, Ana I, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with McLafferty, James William presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLafferty, James William Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions377 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time377 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Dismissal and Sanctions
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court, Filed | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Waiver, Filed | |
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment, Filed | |
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
January 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.