Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank South Dakota Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt, Michael S, against Glenn, Nichole J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with McLafferty, James William presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcLafferty, James William Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time89 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
March 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Contract, Filed | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.