Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
El Sueno Properties Llc, Plater, Mike, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Engel, Daniel E, against Sanchez El Sueno Properties, Louis, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2006 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions242 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time244 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Statement-Agreement or Non-Agreement, Filed | |
August 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal, Filed | |
August 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed | |
July 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
July 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Request for Partial Dismissal, Filed | |
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to ADR Process, Filed | |
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Other ADR - Ordered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.