Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
N V Data Corp, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Limited case represented by Wagner, Darryl L, against Meyer, Joyce, Meyer, Duane, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 1999 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: STATUS? Notice Date: 2007-06-21 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 331 - CASE IS DISMISSED Disp Clerk: LBC Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Roberts, Barbara L |
|
June 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS? Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
May 08, 2000 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: OSC FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE Desc2: ALL DEFENDANTS Notice Date: 2000-03-08 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR/BKRPTCY FILED Disp Clerk: MMC Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
May 08, 2000 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FIRST STATUS CONFERENCE Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: MMC Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 13, 2000 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information LETTER FROM P CNSL RE BKRPTCY; BKRPTCY DOCS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
March 08, 2000 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: OSC FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ALL DEFENDANTS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
January 07, 2000 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference NTC OF FIRST STATUS CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: HBK |
|
December 30, 1999 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED - SUMMONS ISSUED CK#2895 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 158867 Fee Amount: 188.00 Entry Clerk: HBK 40 - $0.00 98 - $0.00 37 - $23.00 46 - $3.00 11 - $3.00 36 - $3.00 8 - $138.00 10 - $18.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.