Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Coronel, Gabriela, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Melville, Rodney S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelville, Rodney S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2006 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions60 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Melville, Rodney S |
|
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
October 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing, Filed | |
October 03, 2006 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.