Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Keener, Scott A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2000 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions54 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time54 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons | |
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing, Filed | |
September 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
September 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.