Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lundstrom, Louis, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Weldon, Richard P, against Merriman, Maureen, Majusevic, Henry, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Belasco, Steven D presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
Time To Trial33 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions35 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment, Filed | |
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Zel, Canter |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Stipulation, Filed | |
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Zel, Canter |
|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing, Filed | |
January 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Request to Set Case for Trial, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.