Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trojan Petroleum Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Smith, Aaron B, against Floyd V Wells Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Melville, Rodney S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelville, Rodney S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management132 days |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time27 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Melville, Rodney S |
|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Contract, Filed | |
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
December 26, 2006 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.