Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D, against O Keefe, Dennis J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Garcia, Arthur A presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2006 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time446 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Non-Service, Filed | |
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Proof of Service
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
March 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause: Proof of Service
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.