Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mission Linen Supply, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tinberg, Sidney, against Silva, Mary, Leon, Arturo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Melville, Rodney S presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2006 |
Category06-Contract - Breach Cont/Warranty - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time13 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Melville, Rodney S |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed | |
December 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed | |
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Contract, Filed | |
November 28, 2006 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.