Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2006 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2006 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review re Depository's Acknowledgment of Receipt Appearance required. Receipt and Acknowledgement of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blocked Account (Judicial Council form M...
Judge: Diana Hall |
|
November 03, 2006 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review re Depository's Acknowledgment of Receipt Appearance required. Petitioner has not filed a completed Receipt and Acknowledgement of Order for the Deposit of Money into Blo...
Judge: Diana Hall |
|
October 13, 2006 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review re Depository's Acknowledgment of Receipt Appearance required. Appearance required. Petitioner has not filed a completed Receipt and Acknowledgement of Order for the Depo...
Judge: Diana Hall |
|
September 22, 2006 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review re Depository's Acknowledgment of Receipt Appearance required. No Acknowledgment of Receipt on file yet.
Judge: Diana Hall |
|
July 28, 2006 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition to Approve Minor's Compromise The following must be submitted before the matter can be recommended for approval: 1) all doctors? reports containing a diagnosis of and p...
Judge: Diana Hall |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.