Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valencia, Rosendo, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Butash, Xxxxxxxx Xxxx, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Judge, No Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, No Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time65 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
October 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Reject Letter | |
October 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
October 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
September 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Judge, No Assigned |
|
September 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Order re: Continuance | |
August 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance, Filed | |
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
July 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.