Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zimmerman, Vida-Marie Mcisaac, Zimmerman, Thomas Edward, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Ware, Helen P, Ware, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Judge, No Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, No Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
September 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
September 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
August 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
August 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
July 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
July 28, 2006 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
July 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.