Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Grover, Shalene filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAMILY MEDIATION | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATED ORDER | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $60.00 Receipt Number 23 2023005717 - Respondent/Husband | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $60.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 10/4/2023 at 0330 PM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF AND NOTICE OF SPECIFIC RELIEF REQUESTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.