Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Vanderbilt Mortgage And Financ, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by White, Leslie Singleterry, against St Onge, William James Jr, Tenant, Unknown, Tobias St Onge, Kelly Elizabet, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 13, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 13, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: June 13, 2023RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 13, 2023PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION-REGARDING POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: June 13, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED ORB 1276 P 638
Date: July 05, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: June 13, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE FOR WILLIAM ST. ONGE, JR.-NON SERVED
Date: June 26, 2023DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: June 13, 2023PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: June 13, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE FOR KELLY ST. ONGE-NON SERVED
Date: June 26, 2023SUMMONS FOR WILLIAM JAMES ST. ONGE. JR.-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 13, 2023SUMMONS FOR KELLY ELIZABETH TOBIAS ST. ONGE-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 13, 2023SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN TENANT-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 13, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE FOR UNKNOWN TENANT-NON SERVED
Date: June 26, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: July 25, 2023FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: July 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED ORB 1276 P 638 | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR WILLIAM ST. ONGE, JR.-NON SERVED | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR KELLY ST. ONGE-NON SERVED | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR UNKNOWN TENANT-NON SERVED | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER #2021-00-06 RE: CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT WITH EXHIBIT A: STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance Inc | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.