Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Kasper, Kathryn Ishee, against Amy M Hendrix, Unknown Spouse, Daniel M Ivey, Unknown Spouse, Envoy Mortgage Ltd, Hendrix, Amy M, Ivey, Daniel M, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 06, 2023SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 06, 2023SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 06, 2023SUMMONS FOR ENVOY MORTGAGE, LTD-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 06, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: June 06, 2023MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: June 13, 2023ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: June 21, 2023RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: June 06, 2023STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: June 06, 2023WRITTEN RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT AMY HENDRIX
Date: August 03, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: June 06, 2023SUMMONS FOR AMY M. HENDRIX-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 06, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE FOR ENVOY MORTGAGE LTD- SERVED
Date: August 07, 2023SUMMONS FOR DANIEL M. IVEY-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 06, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE FOR UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1-NON SERVED
Date: August 07, 2023SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DANIEL M. IVEY-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 06, 2023SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMY M. HENDRIX-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 06, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE FOR UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2-NON SERVED
Date: August 07, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: August 08, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 7/20/23 ON AMY M. HENDRIX
Date: August 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 7/18/23 ON DANIEL M. IVEY
Date: August 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMY M. HENDRIX
Date: August 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DANIEL M. IVEY
Date: August 14, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY
Date: December 20, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 27, 2023PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: December 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: December 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: December 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Event ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE scheduled on 2/5/2024 at 1115 AM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS | |
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 7/20/23 ON AMY M. HENDRIX | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 7/18/23 ON DANIEL M. IVEY | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMY M. HENDRIX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.