Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
State Of Florida Agency For He, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Bruner, James Hamilton Kerr, against The Estate Of Butchy Locke, represented by Bruner, James Hamilton Kerr, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedMay 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
SUMMONS FOR CHRISTINE D. SMALLWOOD MIRANDA, ESQ.-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: April 26, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: April 26, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: April 28, 2023FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: May 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 672023CA000055CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/26/2023 | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to State of Florida Agency for Healthcare Admin | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to The Estate of Butchy Locke | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FOR CHRISTINE D. SMALLWOOD MIRANDA, ESQ.-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00 | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER #2021-00-06 RE: CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT WITH EXHIBIT A: STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.