Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Patterson, Christopher Nida filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FOR NICHOLE TAYLOR | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Husband Attorney: KERRY ADKISON Assigned to SAMUEL TAYLOR | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $397.50 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $397.50 Receipt Number 22 2022005271 | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Case 672022DR000334DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/27/2022 | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50 | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.