Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Webber, Kimberley Turner, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Deleo, James Richard Ii, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED STATMENT OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSTION FORM | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TEST RESULTS | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Event CHILD SUPPORT scheduled on 5/18/2023 at 0945 AM, CH - Judge JACQUELINE SMITH presiding. | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE NON SERVICE FOR JAMES DELEO, II | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | EX- PARTE ORDER COMPELLING GENETIC TESTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.