Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Pasqualone, Joshua David, against Conklin, Kenneth, Hoskins, Lori, Unknown Party 1, Unknown Party 2, Unknown Party 3, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 18, 2022COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE
Date: May 18, 2022ISSUED SUMMONS FOR KENNETH CONKLIN A/K/A KEN CONKLIN-EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: May 18, 2022ISSUED SUMMONS FOR LORI HOSKINS A/K/A LORI CONKLIN-EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: May 18, 2022ISSUED SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN PARTY #2- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: May 18, 2022RECORDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: May 18, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 31, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: May 18, 2022ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: September 01, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE FOR LORI HOSKINS-SERVED SUBSTITUTE KENNETH CONKLIN HUSBAND
Date: May 31, 2022ISSUED SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN PARTY #1- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: May 18, 2022ORDER REQUIRING GOOD FAITH CONFERERRAL
Date: May 24, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED KENNETH CONKLIN
Date: June 03, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE FOR LORI HOSKINS-SERVED SUBSTITUTE KENNETH CONKLIN
Date: June 03, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE FOR UNKNOWN PARTY #1-SERVED SUBSTITUTE KENNETH CONKLIN
Date: June 03, 2022FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: September 12, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE FOR MUNKNOWN TENANT #2-SERVED SUBSTITUTE KENNETH CONKLIN
Date: June 03, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: September 01, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE FOR KENNETH CONKLIN-SERVED
Date: May 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MANAGEMENT on 9/20/2022 0900 AM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CANCELLED on 9/12/2022 | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED KENNETH CONKLIN | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR LORI HOSKINS-SERVED SUBSTITUTE KENNETH CONKLIN | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR UNKNOWN PARTY #1-SERVED SUBSTITUTE KENNETH CONKLIN | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR MUNKNOWN TENANT #2-SERVED SUBSTITUTE KENNETH CONKLIN | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.