Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Williams, Karen A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Williams, Paul D., in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGI | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Event DISSOLUTION scheduled on 6/15/2021 at 1120 AM, CH - Judge DAVID JOHNSON presiding. | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER, WAIVER, AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FOR PAUL DAVID WILLIAMS | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO PAUL DAVID WILLIAMMS | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge: REGISTER , TIMOTHY assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.