Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ace Hardware Corporation, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Weaver, Stephen Kyle, against Pete, Rosalind P, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
This complaint was filed by Ace Hardware Corporation against Rosalind P. Pete in the Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in Washington County, Florida. Ace Hardware Corporation is a foreign for-profit corporation based in Oakbrook, IL, w...
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 3/31/2022 at 0200 PM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number 21 2021002807 | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - ROSALIND PETE | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF, ACE HARDWARE CORPORATION'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to ACE HARDWARE CORPORATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.