Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Murphy, Willie, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Szafran, Dennis Joseph, against Andrews, Tracy, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Willie Murphy against Tracy Andrews in the County Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in Washington County, Florida. The complaint seeks to cancel a deed and quiet title to a property located at 797 Orange St., Chipley...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 05, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2021EXHIBIT -QUITE CLAIM DEED
Date: January 05, 2021EXHIBIT - DEATH CERTIFICATE
Date: January 05, 2021EXHIBIT
Date: January 05, 2021ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 18, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: January 05, 2021ISSUED SUMMONS FOR TRACY ANDREWS- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: January 05, 2021COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 13, 2021ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: January 25, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: January 25, 2021STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: December 09, 2021CORRESPONDENCE FROM PLAINTIFF
Date: November 29, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 11, 2022ORDER OF PENDING DISMISSAL
Date: September 13, 2022CLERK'S RESPONSE TO PRO SE REQUEST
Date: December 30, 2022ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: October 07, 2022ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXECUTE SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2022PRO SE MOTION REQUESTING A STATUS UPDATE ON THE ABOVE COMPLAINT AND DOCKET STATUS
Date: December 19, 2022REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS
Date: May 25, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS
Date: May 25, 2023LETTER TO THE COURT
Date: July 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER TO THE COURT | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S RESPONSE TO PRO SE REQUEST | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PRO SE MOTION REQUESTING THE COURT TO GRANT A CIVIL COMPLAINT AND REOPEN FOR HEARING AND A LIEN, EMAILED TO AW | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PRO SE MOTION REQUESTING A STATUS UPDATE ON THE ABOVE COMPLAINT AND DOCKET STATUS | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM PLAINTIFF | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO EXECUTE SERVICE | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.