Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Guster, Corey James filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 24, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 1/30/2024 at 0100 PM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT 4TH MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE FATHER'S RECENT PLEADINGS | |
July 16, 2023 | Docket Event | HUSBAND'S WITNESS LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.