Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Brady, Danielle filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF UNPAID SUPPORT | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEPOSITORY - REQUEST FOR ACCOUNT ADJUSTMENT | |
September 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
September 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT A | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISRATE | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.