Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bennett, John, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Holley, Geroame, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE [FLA. FAMILY LAW RULE CIV. P. 12.420(D)] | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FOR JOHN BENNETT | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: ROBERTS , RUSSELL S Assigned | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | OBJECTION PETITION TO REINSTATE DRIVER'S LICENSE AND/OR VEHICLE REGISTRATION | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE VIOLATION WARNING DENIAL OF RIGHTS UNDER COLOR OF LAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.