Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Guettler, Evan W, Guettler, Susan, Guettler, Walter, Moura, Adriane G, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 37-D case represented by Chapman, James Stanley, against State Of Florida Department Of, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 3/31/2022 at 0900 AM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDER | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER/COUNTER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - VERIFIED RETURN SERVICE - STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.