Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Us Bank National Association A, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 37-D case represented by Mclain, Robert A, against Microf Llc, Portfolio Recovery Associates, Strickland, Pamela, Unknown Spouse Of Pamela Stric, represented by Mutz, Jeremy A., in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO UNKN SPOUSE OF PAMELA J STRICKLAND- NOT FOUND
Date: August 10, 2020MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: September 02, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO PAMELA J. STRICKLAND
Date: August 26, 2020CLERK'S DEFAULT- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: September 02, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: December 04, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 01, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE-NON JURY TRIAL
Date: July 14, 2021MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: July 28, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MEMO IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: August 12, 2021ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: September 27, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: December 06, 2021PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED PRETRIAL CATALOGUE (WITNESS & EXHIBIT LISTS)
Date: January 19, 2022AGREED MOTION TO CONTINUE
Date: February 03, 2022AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: February 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Event NON JURY TRIAL scheduled on 5/16/2022 at 0945 AM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF NON-JURY TRIAL | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event NON JURY TRIAL on 3/21/2022 0110 PM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CONTINUED on 2/21/2022 | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED MOTION TO CONTINUE | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Event NON JURY TRIAL scheduled on 3/21/2022 at 0110 PM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.