Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Crisp, Donald R, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Harris, Rebecca J, represented by Dever, Steven Mitchell, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT DEFAULT ISSUED FOR GENE R WHITE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: December 18, 2019ANSWER/COUNTER AND GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 04, 2020SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT IN FORECLOSURE
Date: April 17, 2020NOTICE OF SALE- MAILED TO NEWSPAPER- ENVELOPE PROVIDED BY ATTY
Date: April 17, 2020MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: January 19, 2021ORDER
Date: January 21, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF SALE- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: January 27, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: February 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE-RECORDED | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTORNEY | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE-RECORDED | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | BIDDER SHEET | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number 21 2021000921 | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.