Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
United States Of America, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Vilaboa-Abel, Christina, against Kupperman, David Alan, The Estate Of Eileen B White, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EILEEN WHITE NOT FOUND 1/29/20
Date: February 07, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED FOR THE ESTATE OF EILEEN B WHITE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: November 18, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE THE ESTATE OF EILEEN B WHITE NOT FOUND 1/29/20
Date: February 07, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED FOR EILEEN B WHITE UNKNOWN SPOUSE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: November 18, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS NOT FOUND 1/29/20
Date: February 07, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED FOR UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: November 18, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELILEEN WHITE DECEASED SERVED 1/2/20
Date: January 14, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS NOT FOUND 01/29/20
Date: February 19, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE ESTATE OF EILEEN B WHITE SERVED 01/02/20
Date: January 14, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EILEEN WHITE
Date: February 25, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS SERVED 1/2/20
Date: January 14, 2020ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE UNKNOWN PARTY/HEIRS
Date: January 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR THE ESTATE OF EILEEN B. WHITE, DECEASED
Date: March 11, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE
Date: March 11, 2020ISSUED SUMMONS FOR PAULA DANIELS- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: January 05, 2021NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: May 12, 2020NOTICE OF LIFT OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: June 30, 2020NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES
Date: July 20, 2020ANSWER/COUNTER TO VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT - GUARDIAN
Date: July 31, 2020NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES
Date: July 31, 2020MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE UNKNOWN PARTY/HEIRS
Date: January 05, 2021ISSUED SUMMONS FOR SUSAN DENISE WIERZBICKI- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: January 05, 2021ISSUED SUMMONS FOR JOHN F. DEMPSEY- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: January 05, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED
Date: January 20, 2021ISSUED SUMMONS FOR MICHAEL E. DEMPSEY- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: January 05, 2021EX PARTE MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: February 15, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO SUSAN DENISE WIERBICKI
Date: February 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: February 17, 2021ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: February 26, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE ON JOHN F. DEMPSEY
Date: February 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY FOR PAULA DANIELS
Date: April 05, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-PERSON TO BE SERVED-PAULA DANIELS- UNABLE TO SERVE
Date: April 05, 2021NOTICE OF ACTION -CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE-EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: May 20, 2021EX PARTE MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ENTRY OF CLERK'S DEFAULT-ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: June 18, 2021NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: August 02, 2021STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: December 09, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: January 03, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 2/21/22 AT 11AM
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 10, 2022CORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTORNEY
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: January 26, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT AS TO LOST NOTE AND COPY OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE
Date: June 21, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2022AMENDED AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES & COSTS
Date: September 09, 2022BIDDER SHEET
Date: November 16, 2022THIRD PARTY BIDDER INFORMATION SHEET
Date: November 16, 2022NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SALE
Date: October 06, 2022RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: October 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SALE-NO ENVELOPES PROVIDED
Date: November 16, 2022RECORDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF OF PUBLICATION-10/19/2022, 10/26/2022
Date: November 03, 2022TRUST DISBURSEMENT REQUEST, RECEIPT AND COPY OF CHECK
Date: November 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT
Date: November 28, 2022DISBURSEMENT REQUEST WITH SUPPORTING DOCUMENTATION, COPY OF CHECK AND CERTIFIED MAILING
Date: November 28, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 15, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 15, 2019COMPLAINT USDAFLPLEADINGS@JPGILCHRISTLAW.COM
Date: November 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DISBURSEMENT REQUEST WITH SUPPORTING DOCUMENTATION, COPY OF CHECK AND CERTIFIED MAILING | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 5 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number 22 2022005566 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 6 assessed at sum $40,607.50 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 6 Total Assessed $40,607.50 Balance Remaining $40,607.50 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 6 Total Assessed $40,607.50 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $40,607.50 Receipt Number 22 2022005568 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.