Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sweet, Ricky, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Department Of Corrections, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | 1D20-1057 MANDATE AND OPINION | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF MAILING RECORD ON APPEAL TO PARTIES VIA US CERTIFED MAIL | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED DIRECTLY WITH DCA | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE 1D20-1057 | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL WITH ORDER APPEAL ATTACHED | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | RECEIPT TRANSFER | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFED COPIES OF ALL DOCUMENTS SENT TO LEON COUNTY CLERK OF COURT | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to TRANSFER | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE PROPER VENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.