Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Federated Financial Corporation Of America, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Booska, Steven A., against Big D Llc, Devin Skoll, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with David E. Goldstein presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time400 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR SET ASIDE & VACATE SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FEDERATED FINANCIALCORPORATIONOF AMERICA - Minutes GRANTED |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY U.S. MAIL OF APP FOR ORDER SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT ON DEVON A. SKOLL FILED; SERVED ON 06/11/19 Not Applicable Judge: David E. Goldstein |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON MOTION WAS SET FOR 8/05/19 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 15
Judge: Susanne M. Fenstermacher |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 15 | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. BOOSKA FILED RE: ISO APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE & VACATE SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Not Applicable |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY FEDERATED FINANCIALCORPORATIONOF AMERICA ISO APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE & VACATE SATISFACTION Not Applicable |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO/FOR SET ASIDE & VACATE SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FEDERATED FINANCIALCORPORATIONOF AMERICA | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: PROPOSED ORDER RETURNED UNSIGNED Not Applicable |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY FEDERATED Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.