Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Towd Point Master Funding Trus, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Smalbach, Harrison Samuel, against Poulos, Angelique C, The Unknown Tenant In Possessi, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 08, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeCollections |
RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT SERVED
Date: September 17, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE ANGELIQUE C POULOS NOT FOUND
Date: September 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | ALIAS WRIT OF POSSESSION EMAILED TO ATTORNEY | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF REPLEVINS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF REPLEVIN AND WRIT OF POSSESSION NO COPIES PROVIDED DID NOT MAIL OUT ENVELOPES ONLY | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION EMAILED TO ATTORNEY | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ANGELIQUE POULOS RESPONSE/LETTER | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT SERVED | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT SERVED | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ANGELIQUE C POULOS SERVED | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ANGE;;QUE C POULOS SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.