Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Regions Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Reider, David Louis, against Pettis, April R, Pettis, David T Jr, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: May 03, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 03, 2018VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL/ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: May 23, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL/ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING MILTARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE APRIL R PETTIS SERVED | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #2 NOT FOUND | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE DAVID T PETTS JR SERVED | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #1 NOT FOUND | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Case 672018CA000055CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/3/2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.