Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHILDERS, PATRICK S et al vs MADER, MICHAEL C et al
On April 30, 2018 a negligence case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL. Judge REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 30, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 16, 2023
Filing Location
Washington County, FL
Category
Circuit Civil 3-D
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Negligence
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - NEGLIGENCE/WANTONNESS
COUNT I - NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT
COUNT Il —- FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiffs, Shannon R. Collins, Hoyt S. McLendon, Patrick S. Childers, and Steven M. McLendon, against the defendants, Michael Christopher Mader, Shelia Cloud Mader, and fictitious parties A-Z. The …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: Apr 23, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS
Date: Oct 08, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS
Date: Sep 14, 2018ANSWER/COUNTER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: Jul 03, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE jclaypoolhsmclaw.com
Date: Jun 28, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO SHEILA CLOUD MADER
Date: Jun 14, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 30, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALTER, AMEND OR VACATE THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS | |
May 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALTER, AMEND OR VACATE ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ALTER, AMEND OR VACATE THE COURT'S ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Reopened for Civil Other on 4/26/2021 | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 4/12/2021 at 0230 PM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 3/5/2021 at 0115 AM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF READINESS FOR JURY TRIAL | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, SHANNON R. COLLINS | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, SHANNON R. COLLINS | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF, SHANNON COLLINS'S MOTION TO SET TRIAL | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, SHANNON R. COLLINS | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 5/18/2020 at 0200 PM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number 20 20001127 | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Reopened for Civil Other on 3/3/2020 | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL AMENDED JMADDALENA@HANDFIRM | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGEMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS | |
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF VIDEO DEPOSITION OF HOYT S MCLENDON | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF VIDEO DEPOSITION OF PATRICK CHILDERS | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF HOYT S MCLENDON | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PATRICK CHILDERS | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF SHANNON COLLINS | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER MADER VIDEOTAPED | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT SHEILA CLOUD MADER VIDEOTAPED | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DR ANDREW CORDOVER VIDEIOTAPED | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS | |
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES JMADDALENA@HSMCLAW | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - DEF. MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER MADER | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - DEF. SHELIA CLOUD MADER | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION TO NON PARTIES | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER/COUNTER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE jclaypool@hsmclaw | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Defendant Attorney: Julia Claypool Assigned to SHEILA C MADER | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Defendant Attorney: Julia Claypool Assigned to MICHAEL C MADER | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER MADER--- SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON SPOUSE | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO SHEILA CLOUD MADER | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to SHANNON R COLLINS | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | ISSUED SUMMONS FOR MICHAEL CHRISTOPHER MADER EMAILED TO ATTORNEY rcrum@scplaw.us | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number 18 18002545 | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | ISSUED SUMMONS FOR SHEILA CLOUD MADER EMAILED TO ATTORNEY rcrum@scplaw.us | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00 | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS NOT ISSUED | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Case 672018CA000053CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/30/2018 |